Bharat, Winston Safraz Pradeep (CPSO#: 90924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Winston Bharat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Bharat ( CPSO# 90924 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINSTON SAFRAZ PRADEEP BHARAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011