Bhayana, Dinesh (CPSO#: 92888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhayana ( CPSO# 98189 )
Dr. D. Bhayana ( CPSO# 92888 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINESH BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013