Bhojani, Faizal Diamond (CPSO#: 84629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 334
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J8
Phone: 519 822 1888
Fax: 519 822 0788
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faizal Bhojani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bhojani ( CPSO# 84629 )

Business Address:
Suite 334
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 822-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAIZAL DIAMOND BHOJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHOJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011