Bhullar, Harbir Singh (CPSO#: 89901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone: (519) 944-2295
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-4400
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.S. Bhullar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhullar ( CPSO# 89901 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARBIR SINGH BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2010