Bielawska, Hanna (CPSO#: 88776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1106
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Bielawska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bielawska ( CPSO# 88776 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNA BIELAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELAWSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010