Bierbrier, Gordon Stanley (CPSO#: 59908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 216
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 208-9860
Fax: (416) 208-5936
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road South
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough and Rouge Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bierbrier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bierbrier ( CPSO# 59908 )

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
216 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 208-9860

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON STANLEY BIERBRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIERBRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989