Bilbily, Nicole (CPSO#: 75491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Mansoor, Fenar Afif (used until: 11 Jan 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone: (416) 287-3611
Fax: (416) 287-6460
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. BilBily ( CPSO# 101019)
Dr. N. Bilbily ( CPSO# 75491 )

Business Address:
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone Number: (416) 287-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002