Birch, Corey Tyler (CPSO#: 90372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PeopleCare Oakcrossing
1242 Oakcrossing Road
London ON  N6H 0G2
Phone: (519) 6410021
Fax: 2267851070
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-1533
Fax: (519) 645-1556
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Clinic 217
475 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Gracey Medical and Recovery Centre
58 Front Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 205-0637
Fax: (519) 205-0639
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corey T. Birch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015


Corporation Name: Corey T. Birch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Birch ( CPSO# 90372 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1

Business Address:
836 Upper Canada Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7W 1A4

Business Address:
1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8

Business Address:
201 - 240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 435-0111

Business Address:
1242 Oakcrossing Road
London ON  N6H 0G2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COREY TYLER BIRCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 04 May 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2011