Birnie, David Hugh (CPSO#: 73881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 May 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology Rm H1285
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7269
Fax: (613) 696-7123
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Birnie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Birnie ( CPSO# 73881 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4705

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 02 May 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Sep 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2007 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. David Hugh Birnie may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department  of Medicine,  Division  of  Cardiology,  University  of
                        Ottawa, in which Dr. Birnie holds a geographical full-time teaching
                        or research appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent  required by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Birnie no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.