Bismil, Supuneet (CPSO#: 91045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Victoria Ave. E.
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: 8073434300
Fax: 8073434373
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Supuneet Bismil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bismil ( CPSO# 91045 )

Business Address:
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone Number: (807) 343-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUPUNEET BISMIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014