Bitonti, David Isaac (CPSO#: 93556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-7653
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D Bitonti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bitonti ( CPSO# 93556 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Road
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5E4
Phone Number: (416) 243-7653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ISAAC BITONTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITONTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012