Black, Jennifer (CPSO#: 92224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
528 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A6
Phone: (416) 551-6528
Fax: (416) 551-6529
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Black ( CPSO# 92224 )

Business Address:
528 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A6
Phone Number: (416) 551-6528

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011