Blackmore, Elizabeth Jane (CPSO#: 86330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: 613-548-1374
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quite Health Care
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Canada
Phone: 613-392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Blackmore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blackmore ( CPSO# 86330 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009