Blaine, William Christopher (CPSO#: 90251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street South
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: (613) 432-8649
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.C. Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Blaine ( CPSO# 90251 )

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 01 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011