Blake, McKenzie Mary (CPSO#: 90948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 200
240 Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-9119
Fax: (705) 526-0239
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKenzie Blake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blake ( CPSO# 90948 )

Business Address:
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 200, Box 790
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-5825

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MCKENZIE MARY BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012