Blanchette, Nicholas Stanley (CPSO#: 83147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Blanchette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Blanchette ( CPSO# 83147 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4120

Business Address:
Suite 301
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STANLEY BLANCHETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010