Blissett, Sarah Lynn (CPSO#: 93421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Jewish General Hospital
3755 Côte-Ste-Catherine Road
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: 514-340-8222
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Canada
Phone: 613-830-8388
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN BLISSETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLISSETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014