Bohemier, Valerie Renelle Marie (CPSO#: 90950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
909 boul de La Vérendrye
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Fax: (819) 966-6290
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Spring street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie Bohemier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bohemier ( CPSO# 90950 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE RENELLE MARIE BOHEMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHEMIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014