Boisse Lomax, Lysa (CPSO#: 82715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: Boisse, Lysa (used until: 15 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Helath Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6242
Fax: (613) 548-2508
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boisse Lomax Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boisse Lomax ( CPSO# 82715 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYSA BOISSE LOMAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISSE LOMAX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Queen's University, 30 Sep 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013