Bollano, Enkelejda Teli (CPSO#: 84944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical
17730 Leslie st
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical
Green Lane Centre
181 Green Lane E
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Bollano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bollano ( CPSO# 84944 )

Business Address:
York Medical
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENKELEJDA TELI BOLLANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLLANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2009