Borici-Mazi, Rozita (CPSO#: 78082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Room S3 012
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3328
Fax: (613) 546-1572
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rozita Borici-Mazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Borici-Mazi ( CPSO# 78082 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Connell 9/10 Inpatient Unit
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
S3-012
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROZITA BORICI-MAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORICI-MAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006