Borowoy, Alan Michael (CPSO#: 89031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace, Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-881-9810
Fax: 705-915-3500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borowoy and Zborovski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Borowoy ( CPSO# 89031 )
Dr. S. Zborovski ( CPSO# 95264 )

Business Address:
201-11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Business Address:
302-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN MICHAEL BOROWOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012