Borschneck, Daniel Patrick (CPSO#: 64068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart Street Victory 3-354A
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3351
Fax: (613) 548-2390
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Borschneck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borschneck ( CPSO# 64068 )

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040


Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach ( CPSO# 66809 )
Dr. D. Bardana ( CPSO# 68252 )
Dr. D. Borschneck ( CPSO# 64068 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL PATRICK BORSCHNECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORSCHNECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 25 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1998

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)