Boseovski, James (CPSO#: 86173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boseovski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boseovski ( CPSO# 86173 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES BOSEOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSEOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011