Boucher, Daniel Aaron (CPSO#: 88927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone: (705) 335-6033
Fax: (705) 335-5015
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boucher ( CPSO# 88927 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone Number: (705) 335-6033

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL AARON BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012