Boule, Christopher Joseph (CPSO#: 72601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. J. Boule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Boule ( CPSO# 72601 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH BOULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2001