Boulos, Majdi (CPSO#: 95915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Road
Block 1166-1170
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 82197
Fax: 613-738-8206
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majdi Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boulos ( CPSO# 95915 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
Block 1166 - 1170
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAJDI BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2016