Bowler, Kenneth Arthur (CPSO#: 33608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Bowler, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 36 Manitouwabing Estates Rd McKellar ON P2A 0B5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018