Bowman, Caroline Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Practice
Unit 2
30 45th Street South
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0A6
Phone: (705) 429-9445
Fax: (705) 429-9588
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bowman Holloway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Holloway ( CPSO# 79685 )
Dr. C. Bowman ( CPSO# 79159 )

Business Address:
West End Family Practice
Unit 2
30 45th Street South
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0A6
Phone Number: (705) 429-9445

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Collingwood After Hours Clinic
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-9711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ELIZABETH BOWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005