Boyd, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 91382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harbourfront Medical
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone: (416) 366-2273
Fax: (416) 366-5665
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gundars Roze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyd ( CPSO# 91382 )
Dr. G. Roze ( CPSO# 68164 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4Z 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2100

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  K9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2012