Brandt, Michael Gil (CPSO#: 82477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: Brandt, Michael (used until: 04 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone: (416)499-5558
Fax: (416)499-9392
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

** Skin Cancer Referrals ONLY **
1137 Centre Street, Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Canada
Phone: 905-695-2020
Fax: 905-695-3800
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

** Skin Cancer Referrals ONLY **
3292 Bayview Avenue, Suite 205
North York ON  M2M4J5
Canada
Phone: 416-222-7546
Fax: 416-221-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Head & Neck Clinic
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-787-5511
Fax: 416-787-1592
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brandt ( CPSO# 82477 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
Suite 302
1137 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Phone Number: (905) 695-2020

Business Address:
Suite 205
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-7546

Business Address:
101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GIL BRANDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011