Brandt Vegas, Daniel (CPSO#: 89061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building
Room F543
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36607
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2757 King street east
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 573-4819
Fax: (905) 521-6068
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandt Vegas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brandt Vegas ( CPSO# 89061 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
Room F543
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
St Joseph's Urgent Care
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-4819

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL BRANDT VEGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDT VEGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012