Brassard, Stephane Joseph Leger (CPSO#: 95851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (888) 981-6769
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Brassard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brassard ( CPSO# 95851 )

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Health Services Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 366-4605

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5

Business Address:
101 Colonel Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE JOSEPH LEGER BRASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASSARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014