Breen, Corinne Hubertha Lidwina (CPSO#: 76078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Park Place
231 Oak Park Boulevard, Suite 110
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinne Breen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Breen ( CPSO# 76078 )

Business Address:
Oak Park Place
110-231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone Number: (905) 901-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNE HUBERTHA LIDWINA BREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006