Bresee, Natalie Rose Anna (CPSO#: 90952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Bresee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bresee ( CPSO# 90952 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE ROSE ANNA BRESEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRESEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015