Brisebois, Johnny Darren (CPSO#: 67176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-9475
Fax: (613) 591-3778
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-3435
Fax: (613) 250-1896
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: 613-584-3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

7 St.Francis st
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: 613-756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Brisebois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brisebois ( CPSO# 67176 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-9475

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3333

Business Address:
7 St. Francis Street
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHNNY DARREN BRISEBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISEBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995