Broad, Kathleen Louise (CPSO#: 95458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
211 - 90 John St S
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2205
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Broad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Broad ( CPSO# 95458 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
Room 209
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN LOUISE BROAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017