Bross, Adee Hadassah (CPSO#: 88777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Futurity Medical Clinic
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone: (416) 487-2052
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy I. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bross ( CPSO# 88777 )
Dr. J. Cohen ( CPSO# 88783 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
PACE Cardiology Clinic
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
PACE Cardiology Clinic
Units 21-23
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-5338

Business Address:
Futurity Medical Clinic
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEE HADASSAH BROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010