Brotea, Alina Ramona (CPSO#: 76079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Anxiety Treatment & Research Clinic
Level 1, Block 1
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35379
Fax: (905) 521-6120
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Brotea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brotea ( CPSO# 76079 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Level 1 Block B
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINA RAMONA BROTEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROTEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 25 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007