Brown, James Edward (CPSO#: 27495)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 27495 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
Suite C6 - 004
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3662

Business Address:
Suite 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre University Hospital 399 Windermere Road london ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018