Brown-Shreves, Danielle Nikisha (CPSO#: 93105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 419-8000
Fax: (905) 623-0057
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2000 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON  L1G 8C4
Canada
Phone: 905 721 3040
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Brown-Shreves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brown-Shreves ( CPSO# 93105 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Suite 201
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 440-3584

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE NIKISHA BROWN-SHREVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN-SHREVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012