Brule, Stephanie Yasmin (CPSO#: 93202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Brule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brule ( CPSO# 93202 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE YASMIN BRULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014