Brunet, Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 91574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne-Marie Brunet Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brunet ( CPSO# 91574 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE BRUNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011