Budhiraja, Inderpreet Singh (CPSO#: 89760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-in Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2120 North Park Drive
Unit 16
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-0100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

14 lisa street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-2751
Fax: (905) 456-1298
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Inderpreet Budhiraja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Budhiraja ( CPSO# 89760 )

Business Address:
Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
10095 Bramalea Road
Unit 107
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Business Address:
2120 North Park Drive
Unit 16
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDERPREET SINGH BUDHIRAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDHIRAJA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2008