Bueckert, Hartmut (CPSO#: 68763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 837 1401
Fax: 519 837 0133
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph Emergency Medicine Services
103 - 75 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Canada
Phone: 519 837 1401
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Hartmut Bueckert and Natalie Nimetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nimetz ( CPSO# 68784 )
Dr. H. Bueckert ( CPSO# 68763 )

Business Address:
103 - 75 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-6420

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARTMUT BUECKERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUECKERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997