Burghardt, Karolina Maria (CPSO#: 86240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
room 438
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-342-8181
Fax: 613-342-8338
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burghardt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burghardt ( CPSO# 86240 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
438 - 75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROLINA MARIA BURGHARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGHARDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014