Butt, Usne Josiah (CPSO#: 96181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Clinic
4, Meno Ya Win Way, Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K8
Phone: (807) 737-1802
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Englehart Family Health Team
63 5th St
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Canada
Phone: (705) 544-2301
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Atikokan Family Health Team
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Canada
Phone: (807) 597-2721
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USNE JOSIAH BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013