Buu, Michael My (CPSO#: 66963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: Buu, My (used until: 20 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Universite de Hue, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 764-0188
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 Wincott Drive. Unit 12
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Canada
Phone: 416-249-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6400 Milcreek Drive , Unit: 9
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Canada
Phone: 905-821-1406
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3609 Sheppard Ave East, suite: 202
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K8
Canada
Phone: 416-321-2643
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Buu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Buu ( CPSO# 66963 )

Business Address:
12 - 250 Wincott Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 249-0002

Business Address:
9 - 6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 821-1406

Business Address:
300 John Street
Suite 203
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 764-0188

Business Address:
3609 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 202
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K8
Phone Number: (416) 321-2643

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MY BUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1996