Buyukdere, Hakan (CPSO#: 91612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Istanbul University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
4th Floor Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Buyukdere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Buyukdere ( CPSO# 91612 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
4th Floor
Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Medical Records Location

Address: The Moncton Hospital, 135 Macbeath Avenue, Moncton, NB E1C 6Z8
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 26 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAKAN BUYUKDERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUYUKDERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017