Byles, Nancy Islay Anne (CPSO#: 72156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alliston Family Health Team
PO Box 280
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1V5
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Fax: (705) 435-8867
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NIA Byles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Byles ( CPSO# 72156 )

Business Address:
36 Victoria Street West
P O Box 280
Alliston ON  L9R 1V5
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ISLAY ANNE BYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1998 to 26 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jun 1998 to 24 Jul 1998
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002